Accounts and annual returns MINORITY RIGHTS GROUP

Charity number: 282305
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 19 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window