Financial history MINORITY RIGHTS GROUP

Charity number: 282305
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.75m £2.89m £2.90m £4.58m £5.14m
Total expenditure £2.39m £2.65m £3.05m £4.27m £4.15m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £12.53k £111.76k £1.07m £732.84k
Income - Donations and legacies £786.60k £1.08m £1.14m £48.18k £42.01k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.91m £1.77m £1.73m £4.52m £5.09m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.58k £8.74k £9.52k £7.68k £6.16k
Income - Other £42.24k £32.30k £31.21k £11.83k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.35m £2.51m £3.04m £4.12m £4.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds £40.61k £105.78k £8.40k £156.92k £145.47k
Expenditure - Governance £32.47k £31.57k £12.00k £1.22k £811
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £1.02m £991.56k £0 £1.71m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £39.50k £0 £0 £0