ST EDMUNDSBURY NEWSTALK ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 282332
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
VALERIE JEAN FLETCHER Trustee 03 October 2015 None on record
Susan Cunningham-Snell Trustee 14 March 2016 None on record
David John Gooderham Trustee 11 September 2017 None on record
Gill Gane Trustee 11 November 2020 None on record
Gordon William McKay Trustee 01 October 2016 None on record
JACQUELINE MARY FRANCES WHITING Trustee 03 October 2015
WEST SUFFOLK GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Jaqueline Newman Trustee 03 October 2015 None on record
SHIRLEY ANNE STEPHENSON Trustee 03 October 2015 None on record
Iain Davidson Chair 03 October 2015 None on record
Graham Parley Trustee 29 October 2019 None on record
Colin Holmes Trustee 29 October 2019 None on record
MARTIN FREDERICK CHANDLER Trustee 03 October 2015 None on record
Carole Jane Gooderham Trustee 11 September 2017 None on record