ALMAT LIMITED

Charity number: 282351
Charity reporting is up to date (115 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 May 2021 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 May 2021 115 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 26 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 June 2018 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 21 June 2018 141 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 February 2017 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 13 February 2017 13 days late Download