ALMAT LIMITED

Charity number: 282351
Charity reporting is up to date (115 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £34.95k £96.32k £89.68k £69.34k £57.84k
Total expenditure £56.20k £65.10k £65.09k £64.13k £37.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A