Accounts and annual returns THAMIZHAR MUNNERRA KAZHAGAM

Charity number: 282501
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 November 2023 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 November 2020 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 November 2020 7 days late Download Open in new window