Accounts and annual returns ST JAMES' CHURCH WINSCOMBE RINGERS' BELFRY RESTORATION FUND

Charity number: 282529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 07 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 10 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 01 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 30 December 2019 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 11 September 2018 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required