STARKIE BENCE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 282541
Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To support such charitable purposes and such organisations as the trustees shall from time to time in their discretion decide.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023

Total income: £18,897
Total expenditure: £5,100

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 January 1981: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANNE MARGARET ROSS Trustee 07 October 2011
None on record
SG KLEINWORT HAMBROS TRUST COMPANY (UK) LIMITED Trustee
THE RIVER TRUST
Received: 45 days late
THE MID MOSS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
RJ AND AH DANIELS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: 118 days late
C A RODEWALD CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023
Total gross income £37.26k £39.12k £33.37k £4.13k £18.90k
Total expenditure £68.72k £39.07k £32.00k £4.14k £5.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 05 March 2025 394 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 08 June 2023 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 24 August 2022 200 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 24 August 2022 200 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 07 October 2021 244 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 07 October 2021 244 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
One Bank Street
London
E14 4SG
Phone:
02032077091
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available