THE CHIROPRACTIC TRUST FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides funding to chiropractic students to help them pay costs relating to their education, training and associated living costs. Supporting the AECC (Anglo-European College of Chiropractic) in its aims to provide first class chiropractic education, conduct chiropractic research and provide low-cost chiropractic treatment to the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 April 1981: Standard registration
- 27 November 2008: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
- 27 November 2008: Funds transferred to 306289 AECC UNIVERSITY COLLEGE
- BRITISH CHIROPRACTIC TRUST FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2004 | 30/04/2005 | 30/04/2006 | 30/04/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.11k | £8.44k | £9.11k | £12.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.90k | £1.58k | £7.95k | £77.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2007 | 06 February 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2007 | 13 May 2008 | 74 days late | |
Annual return | 30 April 2006 | 28 February 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2005 | 16 May 2006 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2004 | 26 May 2005 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27TH APRIL 1981 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION PASSED ON 24 APRIL 2008 UNDER SECTION 75 OF CHARITIES ACT 1993 AS AMENDED BY CHARITIES ACT 2006.
Charitable objects
A) TO HELP AECCL TO FOUND AND THEREAFTER EQUIP MAINTAIN AND OTHERWISE SUPPORT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM A CENTRE FOR EUROPEAN CHIROPRACTIC EDUCATION. B) TO ESTABLISH SCHOLARSHIPS BURSARIES AND OTHER AWARDS TENABLE AT THE COLLEGE. C) OTHERWISE TO SUPPORT AND PROMOTE THE PURPOSES OF AECCL.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window