SOMERIES SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Disco's held for school children of Someries Infant and Junior Schools. Sports activity fun night for Someries school children. Talent show for Someries Junior school children. Annual Summer Fayre for friends and families of Someries school children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Luton
Governance
- 25 August 1981: Standard registration
- 22 June 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2005 | 01/10/2006 | 15/10/2007 | 01/09/2010 | 01/09/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.76k | £9.93k | £9.20k | £9.86k | £8.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.36k | £9.79k | £9.47k | £11.17k | £3.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2017 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTIO ADOPTED 1ST DECEMBER 1972
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION NOT PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED (IN PRACTICE SOMERIES SCHOOL,LUTON)
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window