Accounts and annual returns JOHN ILES BARNES CHARITY FOR FARMERS AND THEIR WIDOWS

Charity number: 282661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 10 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required