THE FRIENDS OF SPROWSTON COMMUNITY HIGH SCHOOL

Charity number: 282676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 22 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 16 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 18 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 24 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 23 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required