THE FRIENDS OF SPROWSTON COMMUNITY HIGH SCHOOL

Charity number: 282676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £8.57k £11.62k £21.02k £21.50k £718
Total expenditure £8.05k £1.55k £22.18k £10.59k £571
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A