PARENT-TEACHER-FRIENDS ASSOCIATION OF AXMINSTER COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 282695
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 13 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 13 May 2021 347 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 31 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 24 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 07 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required