PARENT-TEACHER-FRIENDS ASSOCIATION OF AXMINSTER COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 282695
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £6.99k £7.42k £7.36k £9.63k £4.61k
Total expenditure £6.55k £4.37k £11.69k £10.50k £3.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A