BELLJOE TZEDOKO LIMITED

Charity number: 282726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 December 2020 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 March 2021 145 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 January 2020 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 13 January 2020 74 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 January 2019 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 January 2019 72 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 26 October 2017 On time Download