THE DORSET HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST

Charity number: 282790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Waite Trustee 26 October 2021
NEW ERA FOUNDATION LTD. Received: On time
SHERBORNE FESTIVAL CHORUS Received: On time
David Euan Barron Grant Trustee 25 February 2020 None on record
Giles Sturdy Trustee 26 June 2017 None on record
PHILIPPA FRANCIS Trustee 23 February 2015 None on record
Michael Warren Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record
James Timothy Smith Trustee 29 June 2015 None on record
Nicholas Head Trustee 26 October 2021 None on record
Major General John Stokoe CB,CBE Chair 01 October 2018
CLAYESMORE SCHOOL Received: On time
STEVEN NORMAN Trustee 01 November 2016 None on record
Sally-Anne Elizabeth Barrett nee Stanbury Trustee 29 February 2016 None on record
SUSAN BRUCE-PAYNE Trustee 31 August 2012
DORSET COUNTY MUSEUM MUSIC SOCIETY Received: On time
Susan Smith Trustee 23 June 2014
ST ANDREW'S CONSERVATION TRUST Overdue by 77 days
Thomas Wickson Trustee 01 June 2019 None on record
Rev Andrew John William Rowland Trustee 23 June 2020 None on record
DR Timothy Connor Trustee 30 June 2013 None on record
Col Jeremy Anthony Montagu Aylwin Selfe Trustee 01 November 2013 None on record
CAPTAIN NIGEL THIMBLEBY Trustee None on record
Roger Bryant Blaber Trustee 27 October 2020 None on record