NAN DIMOND FUND

Charity number: 282858
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The funds are held generally for the purposes relating to Hammersmith & St Marks Hospitals of 150 Du Cane Road, London W12 or to the functions of the Board of Governors thereof under part II of the National Health Service Act 1946 with respect to research into malignant diseases and to diseases of the kidneys.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 20 November 2023

Total income: £11,099
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hammersmith And Fulham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 July 1981: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Zedra Trust Company (UK) Limited Trustee
ALFRED FOSTER SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
THE WILLIAM WEBSTER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: 21 days late
THE FELICITY WILDE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE JOHN AND MARGARET WOOTTON TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE JOHN AND EMMA GALE HOME
Received: 49 days late
JOHN JAMES LEON VARNEY WILL TRUST
Received: On time
THE NICKY AND EILEEN BARBER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
A S BAXENDALE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE LOUTH EVANGELICAL TRUST
Received: On time
REVEREND FRANCIS GISBORNE'S CHARITY (ESTATE TRUSTEES)
Received: On time
ROBERT ORPWOOD BLOTT SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
MAURICE BENINGTON RECKITT, CHARITABLE DISCRETIONARY TRUST
Received: On time
THE SIMPSON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
CLARK CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
DOROTHY MANDALL STRONG MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
ROBERT FRANCIS BOYD TRUST
Received: On time
THE ENDOWMENT FUND FOR THE BISHOPRIC OF THE FALKLAND ISLANDS
Received: On time
DAVID LEWER MEMORIAL COTTAGES
Received: On time
THE SECOND ROSLO CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ELIZABETH HARPER SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
GWLADYS ELIZABATH JOSEPHINE RICHARDSON DECEASED
Received: On time
BOGHOS NUBAR PACHA TRUST
Received: On time
JOAN WILKINSON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PRINCE CHARITABLE TRUST FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/11/2019 20/11/2020 20/11/2021 20/11/2022 20/11/2023
Total gross income £12.25k £10.11k £9.88k £10.83k £11.10k
Total expenditure £5.92k £5.68k £45.54k £10.69k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 November 2023 04 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 20 November 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 20 November 2021 17 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 20 November 2020 14 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 20 November 2019 20 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 November 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ZEDRA UK TRUSTS
Booths Hall
Booths Park 3
Chelford Road
Knutsford
WA16 8GS
Phone:
01565748822
Website:

No information available