ST MARY REDCLIFFE AND TEMPLE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 282884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 10 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 05 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 06 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required