ST MARY REDCLIFFE AND TEMPLE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 282884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £11.11k £12.11k £12.58k £10.92k £10.60k
Total expenditure £16.33k £18.03k £5.97k £6.70k £7.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A