Financial history 1ST WOKINGHAM (ST PAUL'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 282932
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £25.55k £18.10k £24.67k £33.01k £11.59k
Total expenditure £21.26k £16.81k £26.12k £12.51k £44.56k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £20.24k £2.67k