LONDON HOME AND WATER SAFETY COUNCIL

Charity number: 282958
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND JUNE 1982 AS AMENDED 7TH JUNE 1982, 7TH JUNE 1984, 30TH JUNE 1987, 29TH JUNE 1988 AND 9TH JULY 1997
Charitable objects
TO REDUCE THE NUMBER OF ACCIDENTS IN THE GREATER LONDON AREA BY EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN HOME AND WATER SAFETY
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 27 July 1981 : registered
  • 09 September 2014 : removed (DOES NOT OPERATE)
  • 18 September 2014 : re-registered
  • 09 September 2019 : removed (DOES NOT OPERATE)
Other names
  • LONDON HOME SAFETY COUNCIL (Previous name)
What the charity did
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helped
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research