BANWELL SOCIETY OF ARCHAEOLOGY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/training - environmental/conservation/gneral public mankind heritage Provides advocacy/advice/information Sponsor or undertake research Acts as umbrella or research body
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Somerset
Governance
- 12 August 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
michael young | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret McCarthy | Trustee | 12 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
shirley Yarde | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.75k | £79 | £832 | £1.44k | £1.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.26k | £404 | £584 | £1.38k | £1.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 12TH JUNE 1981 AS AMENDED 13TH JULY 1984 AND 9 MAY 1986
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARCHAEOLOGY AND HISTORY OF BANWELL AND THE AREA.
Area of benefit
BANWELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 1
Holland House
53 South Road
WESTON-SUPER-MARE
Avon
BS23 2LU
- Phone:
- 01934412828
- Email:
- mick.young@micksville.org
- Website:
-
banwellarchaeology.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window