Trustees BERKSHIRE FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY
Charity number: 283010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Louise Sampson | Chair | 18 June 2021 |
|
|||||
David John Purling | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN RICE | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Leigh Trevor Dworkin | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Martin Alan Pilkington | Trustee | 18 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Victoria Claire Chesterman | Trustee | 18 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Paul Ferberd Barrett | Trustee | 04 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Gillian Shirley Stevens | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Paul Prince | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Vanessa Anne Chappell | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Sandr Barkwith | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|||||
John Dunne | Trustee | 11 May 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.