Accounts and annual returns FAITH TEMPLE CHURCH OF CHRIST

Charity number: 283023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 February 2022 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 October 2018 245 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required