Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS' CHURCH, NEWNHAM

Charity number: 283088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 November 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required