Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS' CHURCH, NEWNHAM

Charity number: 283088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.16k £5.24k £5.57k £6.98k £9.34k
Total expenditure £3.02k £9.84k £13.87k £7.33k £2.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A