BODMIN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 283123
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 February 2020 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 February 2019 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 01 February 2017 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required