Accounts and annual returns TRURO THREE ARTS SOCIETY

Charity number: 283130
Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 84 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 84 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 05 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 17 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 30 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 12 May 2020 73 days late Download Open in new window