Financial history NORFOLK AND NORWICH OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 283148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £67.43k £100.67k £83.00k £91.30k £22.42k
Total expenditure £98.50k £95.62k £95.30k £80.39k £9.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £10.00k £18.71k