ANADARUS LIMITED

Charity number: 283181
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 24 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 24 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 31 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 31 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 29 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 29 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 28 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 28 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 07 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 07 June 2017 On time Download