Accounts and annual returns CONSTRUCTION HEALTH AND SAFETY GROUP

Charity number: 283249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 April 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 April 2024 On time
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 April 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 January 2023 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 11 January 2023 72 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window