Financial history CONSTRUCTION HEALTH AND SAFETY GROUP

Charity number: 283249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £566.24k £615.16k £294.79k £483.68k £502.33k
Total expenditure £569.16k £623.16k £492.71k £563.93k £637.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £18.10k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £538.72k £586.80k N/A N/A £476.69k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £27.52k £28.36k N/A N/A £25.64k
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £546.48k £590.39k N/A N/A £637.89k
Expenditure - Raising funds £22.69k £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £87.21k £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £32.78k N/A N/A £0