Trustees A C O R D

Charity number: 283302
Charity is insolvent

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR Alioune Sall Chair 15 November 2013
None on record
Jocelyne Vokouma Trustee 02 October 2015
None on record
Naana Otoo-Oyortey Trustee 03 October 2014
None on record
Hussainatu Jummai Adbullah Trustee 14 November 2013
None on record
BONNIE CAMPBELL Trustee 25 October 2012
None on record
DAVID MUNTHALI Trustee 25 October 2012
None on record
JACQUELINE WILLIAMS Trustee 06 May 2011
None on record