THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S AND ST LEONARD'S CHURCHES, WALLINGFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raise funds for maintenance of fabric of St Mary's & St Leonard's Churches Wallingford
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 29 September 1981: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Harvey | Chair | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Lee Muggeridge | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Colin Miles Edgar MA | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Hilary James Wood | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA DOROTHY FINDLAY | Trustee | 30 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
SARAH STREETS | Trustee | 02 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA HAYTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KENNY LESTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.45k | £4.85k | £3.25k | £6.14k | £5.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.07k | £1.20k | £0 | £370 | £15.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 17 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 19 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/08/1981 AS AMENDED ON 24/11/2011
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC OF ST MARY'S AND ST LEONARD'S CHURCHES, WALLINGFORD, AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THEIR HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 CHALMORE GARDENS
WALLINGFORD
OX10 9EP
- Phone:
- 01491836517
- Email:
- findlays2@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window