THE SIMON AND PHILIP COHEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 283331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General charitable causes in accordance with the Trust Deed.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £4,991
Total expenditure: £14,475

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Israel

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 February 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carla Drahorad Trustee 28 November 2023
None on record
ELIZABETH ANNE COHEN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £5.50k £4.13k £4.15k £4.26k £4.99k
Total expenditure £16.25k £14.74k £18.11k £10.51k £14.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 12 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 28 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 07 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 26 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 11 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Cottage
Rear of 2 Blurton Road
LONDON
E5 0NL
Phone:
07712 522665
Website:

No information available