Trustees THE FARNHAM SOCIETY

Charity number: 283335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALAN PATRICK GAVAGHAN Chair
None on record
Paul Fry Trustee 09 September 2021
None on record
Joshua Godfrey Trustee 09 September 2021
None on record
Richard Hunt CBE Trustee 01 April 2020
PHYLLIS TUCKWELL MEMORIAL HOSPICE LTD
Received: On time
CYSTIC FIBROSIS TRUST
Received: On time
MICHELLE QUINLAN Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
JOHN SLATER Trustee 01 April 2015
None on record
JOHN CATTELL Trustee 30 January 2014
None on record
MICHAEL BLOWER MBE Trustee
FRIENDS OF ST ANDREWS
Received: On time
FARNHAM PUBLIC ART TRUST
Received: On time
SIMON F BRADBURY Trustee
None on record
SIR RAY TINDLE Trustee
None on record