Accounts and annual returns THE BARBARA WHATMORE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 283336
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 29 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 29 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 23 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 19 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 19 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 08 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 10 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 14 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 14 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window