THE BARBARA WHATMORE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 283336
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £84.46k £99.56k £100.14k £91.20k £76.94k
Total expenditure £89.38k £87.01k £104.47k £104.70k £70.55k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A