Financial history UNITY LONDON

Charity number: 283340
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £30.72k £28.19k £26.82k £29.43k £35.71k
Total expenditure £47.59k £34.91k £41.53k £28.43k £27.41k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A