Accounts and annual returns MILDENHALL & DISTRICT UNIT NO 574 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 283391
Charity reporting is up to date (46 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 March 2022 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 March 2022 46 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required