Financial history MILDENHALL & DISTRICT UNIT NO 574 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 283391
Charity reporting is up to date (46 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.22k £3.23k £13.72k £6.91k £27.38k
Total expenditure £2.35k £2.71k £12.14k £6.40k £11.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £20.91k