Accounts and annual returns THE BANCROFT PLAYERS

Charity number: 283439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 30 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 30 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 20 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 20 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 09 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 09 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2018 27 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 27 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 19 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 19 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window