Accounts and annual returns LUTON CHRISTIAN BOOK CENTRE

Charity number: 283511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 23 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 23 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 05 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 05 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2019 02 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 02 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2018 13 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 13 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2017 06 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window