Financial history LUTON CHRISTIAN BOOK CENTRE

Charity number: 283511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £97.18k £104.30k £98.39k £88.70k £49.40k
Total expenditure £95.99k £97.69k £98.73k £87.92k £44.82k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £13.41k