CORNWALL THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As the most westerly, all-year round arts venue in the country, The Acorn, Penzance delivers a wide range of quality cultural activities to a broad demographic. It exists to enhance the quality of life for the people, visitors and artists of West Cornwall, though the development and presentation of diverse performing arts to local people at affordable prices.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 10 January 1982: Standard registration
- ACORN ARTS CENTRE (Working name)
- THE ACORN THEATRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alva Katrina Davey | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alastair James Johnston | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Willsher | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Sowerby | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dave Hunter | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MACLAURIN EDMONDS | Trustee | 31 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £300.62k | £102.91k | £116.91k | £284.07k | £439.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £264.51k | £90.04k | £142.93k | £298.65k | £422.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £26.75k | £52.04k | £8.75k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 November 2020 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 November 2020 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23RD SEPTEMBER 1981, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 23 AUGUST 2004 AND 27 SEPTEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, BALLET, MUSIC, SINGING, LITERATURE, SCULPTURE AND PAINTING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CORNWALL THEATRE CO LTD
THE ACORN
PARADE STREET
PENZANCE
TR18 4BU
- Phone:
- 07903938672
- Email:
- ADMIN@THEACORNPENZANCE.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window