CAMPHILL MILTON KEYNES COMMUNITIES LIMITED

Charity Number: 283556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Camphill Milton Keynes provides a community for adults with learning disabilities to live, learn, work and celebrate life together. Individuals are supported to reach their full potential through a range or creative, horticultural and enabling activities and workshops and or through support in maximising independence and developing daily living skills in our accommodation settings.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 November 1981: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • C M K C (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Geoffrey Mark Lightfoot Chair 10 June 2019
None on record
Peter Francis Howard Trustee 07 December 2020
None on record
JOHN EVAN MOFFOOT Trustee 07 September 2020
The Milton Keynes Rose Trust
Received: On time
TOOLS FOR SELF RELIANCE (MILTON KEYNES)
Received: On time
Ian Paul Revell Trustee 07 September 2020
None on record
Rukhsana Mailik Trustee 07 September 2020
None on record
Elaine Lesley Bradley Trustee 09 March 2020
None on record
Elizabeth Helen Sheldon Trustee 09 March 2020
None on record
Susan Elizabeth Prosky Trustee 03 September 2018
None on record
JEREMY COOPER Trustee 24 March 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £2.70m £2.72m £3.58m £4.64m £5.20m
Total expenditure £2.43m £2.84m £3.15m £3.57m £4.52m
Income from government contracts £1.38m £1.80m £2.69m N/A £3.29m
Income from government grants £7.44k £59.44k £67.67k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £366.40k £67.97k £264.96k £380.39k £419.58k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.28m £2.62m £3.27m £3.85m £4.68m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.03k £3.54k £17.13k £29.85k £59.55k
Income - Other £52.38k £25.53k £29.99k £380.95k £40.72k
Income - Legacies £350.00k £0 £148.61k £10.79k £6.16k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.43m £2.84m £3.15m £3.46m £4.26m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £6.32k £108.72k £255.97k
Expenditure - Governance £14.36k £15.01k £14.35k £15.48k £14.34k
Expenditure - Grants institution £27.60k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £5.81k £5.74k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets £1.98m £2.28m £2.49m £2.72m £3.57m
Long-term investments £498.98k £568.57k £544.90k £515.73k £568.26k
Other assets £1.89m £1.63m £1.75m £2.75m £2.89m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £197.78k £352.88k £258.77k £385.86k £696.43k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 13 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 13 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 23 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 23 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 10 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 10 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 01 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 01 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 02 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 02 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Camphill Milton Keynes Community Tr
Japonica Lane
Willen Park
MILTON KEYNES
MK15 9JY
Phone:
01908 235000