NEW LONDON MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 283630
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £72.63k £81.85k £81.54k £96.56k £16.67k
Total expenditure £71.52k £76.16k £74.06k £90.21k £17.97k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A