1ST BRAMFORD SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A balanced programme of adventurous, educational and craft activities, based around the physical, mental and spiritual development of young people from 6 to 18 years, the main aim being to help members grow up to be good citizens.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 19 November 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Grant Usher | Chair | 07 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Carly Singleton | Trustee | 22 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Donald James GOLDING | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Kerrick Ben Newstead | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Swanson Palfrey | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Elizabeth Usher | Trustee | 23 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joy Louise Day | Trustee | 24 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Shona Evans | Trustee | 24 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Caroline Bickers | Trustee | 22 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
DON GOLDING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EVEMAREA BURDER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.77k | £5.06k | £17.89k | £15.30k | £30.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.54k | £9.57k | £13.02k | £14.39k | £32.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 BULLEN LANE
BRAMFORD
IPSWICH
IP8 4JD
- Phone:
- 01473747596
- Email:
- don.golding@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window