THE DAVID BROOKE CHARITY

Charity number: 283658
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 29 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 11 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 11 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 16 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 16 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 02 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 23 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 10 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 31 October 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)